THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:24:26 PM
Fitzgerald, Mary Patricia
CPSO#:
63040
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jul 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jul 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Fitzgerald-Douglas, Mary Patricia (used until: 05 Feb 2007 )
Douglas, Mary Patricia Fitzgerald (used until: 02 Feb 1995 )
Fitzgerald, Mary Patricia (used until: 02 Jan 1995 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Dublin, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:13 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARY PATRICIA FITZGERALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FITZGERALD is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1992 |