THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 11:06:15 AM
Soucy, Louis Joseph
CPSO#:
63032
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Aug 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Aug 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Fax: (613) 798-2980
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Louis Soucy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 29 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Dec 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LOUIS JOSEPH SOUCY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOUCY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 1990 |