THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 1:57:45 AM
Bakbak, Asaad Ibrahim
CPSO#:
63029
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Feb 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Feb 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 721-4903
Fax: (905) 7216661
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:29 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASAAD IBRAHIM BAKBAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKBAK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 1999 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: August 14, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)