THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 18:57:18 PM
Tam, William Yu Kay
CPSO#:
63024
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
08 Mar 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Mar 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, Univers, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: William Tam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 24 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:(1) St Joseph's Health Care, Hamilton
(2) East Region Mental Health Service, Hamilton
Date Received: 08 Mar 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:12 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 1993 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Mar 2018 |