THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 8:20:30 AM
Fiture, Ali Otman
CPSO#:
63023
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Oct 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Oct 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
York Med
250 Harding Boulevard West
Suite 305
Richmond Hill ON L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 787-0303
Fax: (905) 787-0404
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:07 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:10 Sep 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALI OTMAN FITURE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FITURE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 6 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Dec 1998 to 31 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1996 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Sep 1996 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 May 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Oct 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 1997 |
Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On October 3, 2017, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice, Newmarket, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Ali Otman Fiture in respect of an incident that took place in May 2000.