THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 7:42:15 AM
Woolfson, Neil Benjamin
CPSO#:
63020
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Nov 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Surgical Associates
suite 7 2155 Dunwin Drive
Mississauga ON L5L 4M1
Phone: (905) 820-3633
Fax: (905) 820-3352
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Bard Moffat Woolfson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2017
Corporation Name: Neil Woolfson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 6 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:07 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NEIL BENJAMIN WOOLFSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOOLFSON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 1995 |