THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:32:19 AM
Gan, Bing Siang
CPSO#:
63013
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Aug 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 May 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Dutch, English, German, Indonesian
Education: Erasmus University, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON N7T6S3
Phone: (519) 646-6099
Fax: (519) 646-6411
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Netherlands
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:21 Nov 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BING SIANG GAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 May 1992 |