THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:25:03 AM
Gantous, Andres Michel
CPSO#:
62998
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Aug 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Sep 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian, Spanish
Education: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
30 The Queensway
Sunnyside Wing West
Suite 230
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6659
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:02 Sep 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDRES MICHEL GANTOUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANTOUS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 01 Oct 1994
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 1994 |