THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 12:58:44 PM
Chinnasamy, Vimala Josephine
CPSO#:
62975
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Nov 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Nov 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Madras, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
101-520 North Service Road
101-520 North Service Road
Grimsby ON L3M0C9
Phone: (905) 631-1445
Fax: (905) 594-1237
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Vimala Chinnasamy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 14 2021
Corporation Name: Vimala Chinnasamy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 30 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VIMALA JOSEPHINE CHINNASAMY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHINNASAMY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Oct 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 1994 |