THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 4:33:25 AM
Aguilar Rivera, Omar De Jesus
CPSO#:
62965
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Mar 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Aug 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Autonoma De Honduras, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Omar Aguilar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 18 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medical records location as per above.
Bluewater Health
89 Norman St
Sarnia, ON N7T 6S3
Date Received: 29 Mar 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:03 Aug 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Aug 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 1994 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Mar 2018 |