THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 12:19:20 PM
Ganapathy, Sugantha
CPSO#:
62963
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
04 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Jan 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Madras, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Ganapathy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 12 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:16 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 1993 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 04 Sep 2020 |