THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 9:00:01 AM
Gwardjan, Andrzej Jerzy
CPSO#:
62954
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jul 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 May 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Main Floor
10 Ewen Road
Hamilton ON L8S 3C4
Phone: (905) 521-6376
Fax: (289) 768-2476
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. A. Gwardjan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 31 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:11 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDRZEJ JERZY GWARDJAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GWARDJAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Mar 1995
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 1991 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Mar 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 12 Mar 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 May 2021 |