THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:42:42 AM
Chan, Patricia Chee Ka
CPSO#:
62932
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
12 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jul 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Mandarin
Education: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, Univers, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
825 Coxwell Ave
East York ON M4C 3E7
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Patricia C.K. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 20 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:988-4936 Yonge Street Toronto ON M2N 6S3
Date Received: 10 May 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 May 2022 |