THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:13:16 AM
Iyer, Rama Padmanabhan
CPSO#:
62931
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jul 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil
Education: Banaras Hindu University, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 15
1145 Morningside Avenue
Scarborough ON M1B 0A7
Phone: 877 718 2196
Fax: 577 718 0283
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham Public General Hospital Society |
Chatham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:22 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAMA PADMANABHAN IYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IYER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1991 |