THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 15:56:08 PM
Holtby, Joanne Lee
CPSO#:
62930
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 Jul 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Joanne Holtby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Dec 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2017 |