THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:33:34 PM
Paco, Charles Anthony
CPSO#:
62927
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Feb 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Feb 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Liege, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
710 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON L6K 3V7
Phone: 905-607-0022
Fax: 905-607-0013
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:20 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHARLES ANTHONY PACO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PACO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jul 2003
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 1992 |