THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 22:38:41 PM
Bakht, Muhammod Murad
CPSO#:
62926
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Feb 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Feb 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English
Education: Dacca Medical College, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 50619
Fax: (905) 494-6451
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:20 Nov 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MUHAMMOD MURAD BAKHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKHT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Jul 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 01 Feb 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Feb 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 1999 |