THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 17:16:26 PM
Cuddihy, Pamela Margaret
CPSO#:
62925
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jul 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jul 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Saccomanno, Pamela Margaret (used until: 22 Jan 2013 )
Cuddihy, Pamela Margaret (used until: 22 Aug 1994 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
78 King Street East
Thornbury ON N0H 2P0
Phone: 705-888-5394
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:09 Nov 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAMELA MARGARET CUDDIHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUDDIHY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 1994 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2019 |