THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 3:00:37 AM
Kanji, Dilshad Alaudin
CPSO#:
62876
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Kachchi, Swahili
Education: University of Zambia, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:298 Sheppard East, Toronto, ON, M2N 3B1
Date Received: 01 Jul 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Rheumatology |
Effective:24 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:02 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jul 2022 |