THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 23:15:19 PM
Maxwell, Robert Ian
CPSO#:
62867
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jul 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Surgery
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1993 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT IAN MAXWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAXWELL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 1991 |