THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 2:27:42 AM
Ngo, Thi Ngoc Thai
CPSO#:
62841
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Apr 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Vietnamese
Education: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Thai Ngo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 6 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. Saad Hussain
Unit 10
5153 Tomken Road
Mississauga, ON
L4W 1P1
Phone: 1-905-275-8226
Date Received: 20 Sep 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1990 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2022 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: April 8, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ngo to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 8th, 2022:
Allegations of professional misconduct against Dr. Ngo were referred to the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal, namely allegations that she engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, and that she contravened a term, condition or limitation on her certificate of registration.
In the face of these allegations, Dr. Ngo resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Member
Active Date: August 3, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Ngo has voluntarily limited her practice to Vietnamese and French-speaking individuals.