THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 21:15:07 PM
Stephen, Wesley John
CPSO#:
62831
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Oct 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Oct 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
207-3155 Harvester Rd
Burlington Endoscopy and Specialist
Burlington ON L7N 3V2
Phone: 905 631 2080
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Wesley J. Stephen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 6 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:26 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WESLEY JOHN STEPHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEPHEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Jun 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2001 |