THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 11:14:01 AM
McAlister, Vivian Charles
CPSO#:
62815
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Apr 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Dublin Trinity College, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: V.C. McAlister Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 20 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:University Hospital
339 Windermere Road, Room B1-100
P.O. Box 5339, Stn. Z
London, Ontario
N6A 5A5
Date Received: 20 Apr 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:28 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
CF - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Apr 2022 |