THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 4:17:39 AM
Huculak, George Erast
CPSO#:
62811
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Sep 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Sep 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Ukrainian
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GEORGE ERAST HUCULAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUCULAK is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Aug 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Apr 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 1992 |