THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 22:16:32 PM
Knoll, Gregory Alan
CPSO#:
62810
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
Department of Medicine
Suites M1857, Box 206
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-737-8755
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:08 Sep 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GREGORY ALAN KNOLL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNOLL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1990 |