THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 12:13:35 PM
Grant, Darrell William
CPSO#:
62792
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
800 Niagara Street North suite G1
Welland ON L3C 5Z4
Phone: (905) 732-4451
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Darrell Grant Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 1990 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:20 Sep 1991 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DARRELL WILLIAM GRANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRANT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1990 |