THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 14:44:08 PM
Terespolsky, Deborah
CPSO#:
62787
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Dec 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Jun 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:2200 Eglinton Avenue West, Mississauga, Ontario L5M 2N1
Date Received: 17 Dec 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:03 Jun 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2018 |