THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 1:56:44 AM
Pandya, Sudhir Prataprai
CPSO#:
62782
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Swahili
Education: University of Nairobi, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
#301
Peterborough clinic
26 hospital drive
Peterborough ON K9J 7C3
Phone: 705-740-6878
Fax: 705-740-6899
Electoral District: 06
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking a copy of their medical record should contact:
Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough, ON
K9J 7C3
Tel: 705-743-2040
Date Received: 06 Feb 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:17 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:20 Nov 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUDHIR PRATAPRAI PANDYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANDYA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 May 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2015 |