THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 12:35:44 PM
Coveney, Marian Lynn
CPSO#:
62781
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
26 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Feb 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. M. Lynn Coveney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 11 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London, ON N6A 5W9
Date Received: 22 Jul 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:04 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 1991 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Feb 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 20 Feb 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Jun 2015 |