THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 4:13:22 AM
Don, Joan Caroline
CPSO#:
62771
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jun 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Dutch, English, French, Spanish
Education: McMaster University, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
170 Colborne St W
Orillia ON L3V 2Z3
Phone: 705-325-2201
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nunavut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) |
Hearst |
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital |
Orillia |
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority |
Moose Factory |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOAN CAROLINE DON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Apr 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 May 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1990 |