THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:21:34 PM
Tucker, Tara Lorraine
CPSO#:
62735
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jul 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
79 Ossington Ave
Ottawa ON K1S 3B5
Phone: 613-422-6641
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TARA LORRAINE TUCKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUCKER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 03 May 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Palliative Care Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 02 May 2006
CF - Palliative Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1991 |