THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 7:46:32 AM
Flamand, Francois Jean
CPSO#:
62734
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Aug 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Aug 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Manitoba, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
50 Sportsworld Crossing Rd
Tri City Colonoscopy Clinic
Kitchener ON N2P 0A4
Phone: 519 650-2777
Fax: 519 650-5577
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:05 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FRANCOIS JEAN FLAMAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLAMAND is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 1991 |