THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 7:23:25 AM
Marshall, Shawn Calder
CPSO#:
62706
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Apr 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Apr 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
505 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8M2
Phone: 6137378899 Ext. 75306
Fax: 6137376877
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bruyere Continuing Care |
Ottawa |
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAWN CALDER MARSHALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSHALL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 22 Jun 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Apr 1997 |