THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 11:21:43 AM
Sayal, Manoj Kumar
CPSO#:
62696
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Toronto, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 319
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 1M1
Phone: (905) 618-0098
Fax: (905) 618-0100
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MANOJ KUMAR SAYAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAYAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1992 |