THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 5:16:12 AM
Bulanski, Emily Martha
CPSO#:
62683
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Aug 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Delta Coronation FHO
Unit 201
614 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON N1R 3E8
Phone: (519) 620-7122
Fax: (519) 623-7342
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: October 1, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On August 29, 2022, Cambridge Memorial Hospital notified the College, pursuant to section 33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and section 17.1(5) of the Personal Health Information Protection Act, 2004, that Dr. Bulanski’s hospital privileges were suspended from October 1, 2022 to December 31, 2022.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 1992 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EMILY MARTHA BULANSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BULANSKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 1991 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2019 |