THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 17:58:36 PM
Khalidi, Nader Amir
CPSO#:
62678
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Nov 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Nov 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Hospital
Fontbonne Building
F336
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: 905 521 9034
Fax: 905 521 8099
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:13 Nov 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:12 Sep 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NADER AMIR KHALIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALIDI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Nov 1991 |