THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:08:32 PM
Tuli, Raman
CPSO#:
62667
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2211 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K2B 7E9
Phone: (613) 226-5455
Fax: (613) 226-9478
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:27 Oct 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAMAN TULI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TULI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1991 |