THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 3:33:26 AM
Leung, Ceta Gen Man Yee
CPSO#:
62655
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin
Education: University of Toronto, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1448 Lawrence Avenue East
suite 206
Toronto ON M4A 2V6
Phone: 4166099072
Fax: 4166093193
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CETA GEN MAN YEE LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 1991 |