THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:48:19 AM
Madarnas, Yolanda
CPSO#:
62649
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
265 Dundas St E
Belleville General Hospital
Douglas A MacIntosh Cancer Clinic
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Phone: 613- 969-7400 Ext. 2380
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:04 Sep 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YOLANDA MADARNAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MADARNAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1991 |