THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:00:09 PM
Bihun, Julia Anne Patricia
CPSO#:
62638
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Aug 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
118-2 Gould St
Rideau Community Health Centre
Smiths Falls ON K7A 2S5
Phone: 613-283-1952
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 1992 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JULIA ANNE PATRICIA BIHUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIHUN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 1991 |