THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 10:16:20 AM
Mehta, Navdeep
CPSO#:
62628
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Feb 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Ramsey Lake Health Center
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 522-2200 Ext. 4722
Fax: (705) 671-7372
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:07 Sep 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAVDEEP MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2001 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Oct 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 29 Oct 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 10 Sep 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 04 Jun 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2016 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2018 |