THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 14:51:05 PM
Safranyos, Richard Gregory Alexander
CPSO#:
62619
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hungarian
Education: University of Toronto, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
P.O.Box 247
Fonthill ON L0S1E0
Phone: 289-529-0253
Fax: 289-275-1003
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital |
Dunnville |
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site |
Fort Erie |
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site |
Port Colborne |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Nov 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:21 Nov 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RICHARD GREGORY ALEXANDER SAFRANYOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFRANYOS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1992 |