THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:17:52 PM
Calzonetti, Elizabeth Anne
CPSO#:
62574
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Apr 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Doull, Elizabeth Anne (used until: 09 Jun 1998 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
Phone: (905) 975-4347
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:26 May 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANNE CALZONETTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALZONETTI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Mar 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 28 May 1999
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Apr 1992 |