THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 18:01:17 PM
Dent, Susan Faye
CPSO#:
62571
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jun 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
DUMC 3446
Durham North Carolina
27710
Durham NC 27705
United States
Phone: 919-684-5734
Fax: 919-681-0874
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Susan Dent Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 21 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - North Carolina
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:07 Sep 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUSAN FAYE DENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1992 |