THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 23:21:07 PM
Ginty, Alexandra Clare
CPSO#:
62570
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Sep 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 1992 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:08 Dec 1993 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA CLARE GINTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINTY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 1991 |