THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:57:06 AM
Harrington, Leah Dawn
CPSO#:
62555
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Mar 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Westway Medical Clinic
1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON M9R 2Y8
Phone: (416) 244-7617
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Leah Harrington Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:31 Dec 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LEAH DAWN HARRINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRINGTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Mar 1992 |