THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 19:38:44 PM
Jhirad, Ronen Haeem
CPSO#:
62544
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 May 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 May 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: 905-494-2120
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:05 Sep 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RONEN HAEEM JHIRAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JHIRAD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 05 Apr 1999 to 30 May 1999
EL - Vascular Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 May 1992 |
Concerns
Source:
Other Canadian Colleges
Notice Type Discipline Findings in Other Jurisdictions
Active Date: July 13, 2018
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.
The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:
On July 4, 2017, an Investigation Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Nova Scotia made a decision to reprimand Dr. Jhirad for failing to properly dispose of confidential medical records on or about April 1, 2016 in Sydney, Nova Scotia. The decision was made with the consent of Dr. Jhirad instead of referring the matter to a hearing. The College was notified of this finding by information received on March 5, 2018.