THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:36:10 AM
Singal, Rajiv Kumar
CPSO#:
62494
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: University of Toronto, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 218
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 469-3314
Fax: (416) 469-2511
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Timmins and District Hospital |
Timmins |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:10 Sep 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAJIV KUMAR SINGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1991 |