THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 12:29:16 PM
Rosen, Harold David
CPSO#:
62489
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Sep 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Sep 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: 16138513426
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:31 Dec 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HAROLD DAVID ROSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
CF - Paediatric Critical Care
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2004 |