THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 4:38:12 AM
Stone, Anthony Benedict
CPSO#:
62487
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3200
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 623-2355
Fax: (905) 623-9607
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site |
Bowmanville |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANTHONY BENEDICT STONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STONE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 1991 |